DE SB56 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act will require insurers administering CHIP buy-in programs in other states to cause similar buy-in programs to be offered in Delaware if they should engage in specified transactions or affiliations with Delaware health service corporations.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Health Service Corporations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-15 | SS 1 for SB 56 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-06-14 | SS 1 for SB 56 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-06-14 | SS 1 for SB 56 - Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2011-06-14 | SS 1 for SB 56 - Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2011-06-08 | SS 1 for SB 56 - Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2011-05-10 | SS 1 for SB 56 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-05-04 | SS 1 for SB 56 - Reported Out of Committee (INSURANCE) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2011-05-04 | SS 1 for SB 56 - Re-Assigned to Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2011-05-04 | Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 56 | |
2011-04-12 | Assigned to Insurance Committee in Senate |