DE SB54 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill codifies Delawares compatibility with certain sections of the Federal Code of Regulations related to weight of vehicles and loads and commercial vehicle safety. Delaware enforces violations contained in the Code of Federal Regulations Parts 374, 385, and 386 and wishes to formally adopt those parts and any subsequent amendments thereto.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Size And Weight Of Vehicles And Loads And Motor Carrier Safety - Responsibility.
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Rep. William Carson [D] | Sen. Charles Paradee [D] | Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Rep. Edward Osienski [D] | Rep. John Viola [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-04 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-04-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-04-04 | Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |
2019-03-28 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-03-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-20 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate |