DE SB53 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Diwali is a 5-day festival of lights, celebrated by millions of Hindus, Sikhs, and Jains across the world. The dates for Diwali change each year, but it usually falls in October or November. Fireworks are an essential component of Diwali and the third day of Diwali is the height of the festival.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Exceptions To Selling Or Possessing Fireworks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2019-04-04 Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
2019-03-28 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2019-03-27 Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2019-03-19 Introduced and Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback