DE SB53 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-15 - Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 6 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-15 - Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 6 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill creates a presumption that a covered firefighter who has heart disease, hypertension, lung disease or certain cancers contracted the occupational disease arising out of and in the course of actions in the line of duty.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Pertaining To Line-of-duty Disability Benefits To Covered Firefighters.
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Rep. William Carson [D] | Rep. Joseph Miro [R] | Sen. Gerald Hocker [R] |
Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] | Rep. John Atkins [D] | Rep. Earl Jaques [D] | Rep. John Kowalko [D] |
Rep. John Mitchell [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-15 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 6 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits |
2013-06-27 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Amendment SA 3 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Amendment SA 3 - Introduced in Senate |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Lifted From Table in Senate |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Laid On Table in Senate |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 to SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 to SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate |