DE SB53 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This legislation adds a new Section 1333 to Chapter 13, Investments. The new section provides additional investment flexibility to domestic insurers that are well capitalized by increasing the aggregate investment limitations contained in various sections of Chapter 13. This legislation applies to insurers having a Risk Based Capital (RBC) level greater than 400% of the RBC Authorized Control Level.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Insurance And To The Investment Flexibility For Well-capitalized Insurance Companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-09 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-06-01 | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 10 On Its Merits | |
2011-05-10 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House | |
2011-05-05 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-05-05 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-04-13 | Reported Out of Committee (INSURANCE) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2011-04-07 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2011-04-05 | Assigned to Insurance Committee in Senate |