DE SB53 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This act amends the Town Charter of the Town of Wyoming by changing the designated fiscal year from May 1 through April 30 to July 1 through June 30.
Title
An Act To Amend The Municipal Charter Of The Town Of Wyoming (43 Del. Laws 189) To Designate The Fiscal Year For The Town As July 1 Through June 30
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-04-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-07 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-30 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-04-29 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2009-04-08 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House | |
2009-04-07 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-04-01 | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2009-03-25 | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |