DE SB52 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]


This Act will allow a retired Delaware attorney to satisfy a mortgage that the attorney paid off while in practice. Currently only attorneys still in active practice are permitted to satisfy mortgages under Section 2120. This limitation can leave no practicable way to satisfy a mortgage for which the lender fails to record a satisfaction as required by State law if the attorney who paid off the mortgage subsequently retires. This Act will also expand the scope of Section 2120 to include partial releases of a mortgage where a Delaware attorney made a partial payment to release a portion of the mortgaged property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


An Act To Amend Title 25 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Satisfaction And Partial Release Of Mortgages.


Roll Calls

2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]


2017-09-29 Signed by Governor
2017-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-05-03 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 10 On Its Merits
2017-04-26 Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
2017-04-25 Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT
2017-04-05 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2017-03-30 Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources

Bill Comments