DE SB51 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act increases the monetary penalties for sanctions by the Board of Plumbing, Heating, Ventilation, Air Conditioning, and Refrigeration Examiners.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Disciplinary Sanctions By
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2021-06-29 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-03-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 6 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2021-03-10 | Assigned to Labor Committee in House | |
2021-03-09 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-01-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2021-01-22 | Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate |