DE SB51 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act clarifies the definition of "subsequent offense" to mean a like offense occurring within 3 years of the former offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Electronic Communication Devices And Penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17 Signed by Governor
2018-03-13 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 6 On Its Merits
2017-05-18 Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
2017-05-17 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-05-17 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-05-17 Amendment SA 1 to SB 51 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-05-02 Amendment SA 1 to SB 51 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-04-26 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-03-28 Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback