DE SB51 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill expands the definition of a person eligible to testify remotely by means of closed circuit television. In any prosecution involving an offense set forth in 11 Del. C. 3513(a), a court may order that the testimony of a victim or witness, regardless of age, be taken outside of the presence of a jury by means of closed circuit television.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Witnesses And Evidence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-30HouseSigned by Governor
2015-06-25SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2015-06-25SenateNecessary rules are suspended in Senate
2015-06-25SenateIntroduced in Senate
2015-06-25HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 21 YES 12 NO 7 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2015-06-25HouseAmendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
2015-06-25HouseAmendment HA 1 - Introduced in House
2015-06-25HouseNecessary rules are suspended in House
2015-06-25SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2015-06-25SenateAmendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2015-06-25SenateAmendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate
2015-06-24SenateReported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
2015-04-01SenateAssigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback