DE SB51 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill strengthens teacher preparation by raising the standards for entry into the teaching profession. More specifically, the bill requires all Delaware teacher preparation programs to set high admission and completion requirements, to provide high-quality student teaching experiences and ongoing evaluation of program participants, and to prepare prospective elementary school teachers in age-appropriate literacy and mathematics instruction. Further, the bill requires preparation programs to track and report data on the effectiveness of their programs. Finally, the bill requires new educators to pass both an approved content-readiness exam and performance assessment before receiving an initial license, and requires special education teachers to demonstrate content knowledge if they plan to teach in a secondary subject.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Educator Licensure, Certification, And Preparation Programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-12SenateSigned by Governor
2013-05-16HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 2 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2013-05-16HouseAmendment HA 2 - Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 7 YES 33 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2013-05-16HouseAmendment HA 2 defeated
2013-05-16HouseAmendment HA 2 - Introduced in House
2013-05-16HouseAmendment HA 1 - Defeated in House by Voice Vote
2013-05-16HouseAmendment HA 1 defeated
2013-05-16HouseAmendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2013-05-08HouseReported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
2013-04-24HouseIntroduced in House and assigned to Education Committee
2013-05-07HouseAssigned to Education Committee in House
2013-05-02SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2013-05-02SenateAmendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2013-05-02SenateAmendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate
2013-05-02SenateReported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2013-04-24SenateAssigned to Education Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback