DE SB5 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act creates an automatic voter registration system at the Delaware Division of Motor Vehicles (DMV) and grants the State Election Commissioner the authority to implement automatic voter registration at other state agencies that already offer voter registration services under existing law.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 15 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Registration Of Voters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-05-18 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 NO | |
2021-04-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2021-03-31 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2021-03-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 7 NO | |
2021-03-24 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2021-03-11 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |