DE SB48 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
This Act increases the penalty for violations of the Board of Electrical Examiners licensing regulations in situations involving fraud and material deception, or where a person has performed electrical work in a category for which the practitioner is not licensed.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Disciplinary Sanctions By
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2021-06-29 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-03-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 6 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2021-03-10 | Assigned to Labor Committee in House | |
2021-03-09 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-01-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2021-01-26 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 48, and Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate |