DE SB48 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Under this Act, a pharmacist who dispenses narloxone under an established set of circumstances is not subject to disciplinary or other adverse action under any professional licensing statute or criminal liability, or liable for damages related to injuries or death sustained in connection with administering the drug, unless it is established that the pharmacist caused the injuries or death wilfully, wantonly, or by gross negligence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Naloxone.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-20 Signed by Governor
2017-06-06 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-06 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2017-06-06 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-06-06 Amendment HA 1 to SB 48 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-05-16 Amendment HA 1 to SB 48 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-03 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2017-04-27 Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2017-04-26 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-04-05 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2017-03-30 Introduced and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback