DE SB47 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 6 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]

Summary

This Act clarifies that yard waste is included in the types of trash and litter that it is illegal to discard on a highway. This Act also defines yard waste.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Discarding Yard Waste On A Highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 6 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2021-03-17 Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
2021-03-16 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2021-03-16 Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2021-03-12 Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-03-10 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2021-02-12 Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 47, and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback