DE SB46 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This legislation modernizes Delaware's Self-Service Storage Facility Act to account for the wide proliferation of online news and auction sites, as well as to establish frameworks for: (1) towing of certain property for which rent and other charges are in default; (2) use of information contained within property sold or otherwise disposed of; and (3) contractual provisions relating to limits on the value of stored property and to late fees, as well as transparency related to both.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 25 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Self-service Storage Facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-14 Signed by Governor
2017-07-02 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 2 NO 2 ABSENT
2017-07-02 Amendment HA 1 to SB 46 - Defeated In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-07 Amendment HA 1 to SB 46 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-10 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 10 On Its Merits
2017-05-02 Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
2017-04-27 Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 2 NO 3 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2017-04-27 Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 2 NO 3 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2017-04-27 Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 2 NO 3 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2017-04-27 Amendment SA 1 to SB 46 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2017-04-26 Amendment SA 1 to SB 46 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-04-05 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
2017-03-23 Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback