DE SB45 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Bill adds 3,4-dichloro-N-[2-(dimethylamino)cyclohexyl]-N-methylbenzamide (U-47700) to Schedule I of the Uniform Controlled Substances Act. U-47700, also known as Pink, is a synthetic opioid recently encountered by law enforcement and public health officials and is being abused for its opioid properties. It is available over the Internet and is marketed as a research chemical. The safety risks to users are significant and the public health risks include large numbers of drug treatment admissions, emergency room visits and fatal overdoses. On November 14, 2016, the Federal Drug Enforcement Agency temporarily placed U-47700 in Schedule I for a two-year period, finding that this synthetic opioid has a high potential for abuse, no currently accepted medical use in treatment in the United States and lacks accepted safety for use under medical supervision. By Emergency Order dated December 15, 2016, the Secretary of State temporarily placed U-47700 in Schedule I. This Order is effective for 120 days. The permanent addition of U-47700 to Schedule I is required in the interest of public protection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Uniform Controlled Substances Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-17 Signed by Governor
2017-05-18 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-05-03 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 9 On Its Merits
2017-04-27 Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2017-04-26 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-04-26 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-04-05 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-03-30 Introduced and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback