DE SB44 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Bill clarifies that every prescriber holding a controlled substance registration must be registered with the Prescription Monitoring Program. Further, prescribers who receive a CSR (controlled substances registration) for the first time must register with the Prescription Monitoring Program within 90 days.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Uniform Controlled Substances Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21 Signed by Governor
2017-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-05-03 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 10 On Its Merits
2017-04-27 Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2017-04-26 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-04-26 Amendment SA 1 to SB 44 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-04-26 Amendment SA 1 to SB 44 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-04-05 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-03-30 Introduced and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback