DE SB44 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill clarifies that every prescriber holding a controlled substance registration must be registered with the Prescription Monitoring Program. Further, prescribers who receive a CSR (controlled substances registration) for the first time must register with the Prescription Monitoring Program within 90 days.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Uniform Controlled Substances Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2017-05-03 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 10 On Its Merits | |
2017-04-27 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2017-04-26 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-04-26 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 44 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-04-26 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 44 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-04-05 | Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2017-03-30 | Introduced and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate |