DE SB42 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

This Act permits individuals to add their resident minor child and foster child to their existing motor vehicle insurance policies as additional drivers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Addition Of Minor Licensed Children And Foster Children To Existing Motor Vehicle Policies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-17 Signed by Governor
2017-07-02 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-04-26 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 10 On Its Merits
2017-04-06 Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
2017-04-05 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-04-05 Amendment SA 2 to SB 42 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-04-05 Amendment SA 1 to SB 42 - Stricken in Senate
2017-04-04 Amendment SA 2 to SB 42 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-03-30 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2017-03-29 Amendment SA 1 to SB 42 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-03-23 Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback