DE SB41 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
In an effort to reduce overdose deaths relating to the growing epidemic of opioid addiction, this Act requires carriers to provide coverage for medically necessary inpatient treatment of alcohol and drug dependencies and prohibits carriers from imposing precertification, prior authorization, pre-admission screening, or referral requirements for the diagnosis and treatment, including in-patient treatment, of drug and alcohol dependencies. This Act also makes technical corrections to conform existing law to the standards of the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Coverage For Serious Mental Illness And Drug And Alcohol Dependency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-05-09 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT | |
2017-04-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 10 On Its Merits | |
2017-04-05 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House | |
2017-04-04 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-04-04 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 41 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-04-04 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 41 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-03-30 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2017-03-23 | Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate |