DE SB41 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act gives State law enforcement agencies the ability to prosecute those who aim the beam of a laser pointer at an aircraft. This Act supplements Federal prosecution efforts focused on deaths or injuries caused by use of laser pointers by enacting a state law prohibiting aiming the beam of a laser pointer at an aircraft that does not result in death or injury.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 2 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Uniform State Aeronautics Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Enact w/o Sign by Governor |
2015-06-24 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits |
2015-04-28 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate |