DE SB40 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This legislation adopts the NAICs Corporate Governance Annual Disclosure Model Act, and requires Delaware-domiciled insurers to provide to the Commissioner on an annual basis a summary of the insurers or insurance groups corporate governance structures, policies and practices to permit the Commissioner to gain and maintain an understanding of the insurers corporate governance framework.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Insurance Company Disclosure Requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-02 Signed by Governor
2017-07-02 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-06-07 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 9 On Its Merits
2017-04-26 Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
2017-04-25 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-04-25 Amendment SA 1 to SB 40 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-04-05 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2017-04-04 Amendment SA 1 to SB 40 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-03-23 Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback