DE SB39 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill clarifies that Probation Before Judgment (PBJ) may be entered for multiple charges arising from a single arrest. Changes to the legislation also allow for a defendant to be permitted Probation Before Judgment more than once in a five year period so long as offenses are in different titles of the Code. For example, a defendant who was granted PBJ in 2017 for speeding (title 21) would be eligible for PBJ on a title 11 charge (e.g. bad check) or title 4 (e.g. underage consumption of alcohol) in 2019.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Probation Before Judgment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-04-01 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-03-26 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-03-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2021-03-12 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2021-03-11 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-03-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2021-03-09 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |