DE SB39 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 27 2016 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-28 - Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
Pending: House Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 27 2016 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-28 - Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
Pending: House Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill provides for an increase of the minimum wage by .50 cents per year for the next 4 years beginning June 1, 2016 and adds a COLA increase thereafter.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Minimum Wage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 11 YES 8 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Amendment SA 4 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 12 YES 7 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Amendment SA 4 - Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Lifted From Table in Senate |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Laid On Table in Senate |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 5 YES 13 NO 3 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 defeated |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Amendment SA 3 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 13 YES 8 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Amendment SA 3 - Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Stricken |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Stricken |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (LABOR & INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2015-11-30 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to Labor & Industrial Relations Committee in Senate |