DE SB38 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]

Summary

In 2019, the 150th General Assembly enacted Senate Substitute No. 1 for Senate Bill No. 37, which reformed the adult expungement process in this State. After a year of implementing this new expungement process, Senate Bill No. 38 was introduced to make changes to clarify language or increase the efficiency of the process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Expungement Of Records Of Adult Arrest And Conviction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17 Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
2021-03-16 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2021-03-10 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2021-03-04 Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 38, and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback