DE SB38 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

For purposes of clarity regarding Delaware's commitment to supporting Delawareans with disabilities, including military service-related disabilities, this Act codifies existing county-level tax exemptions. Absent this Act, Delaware will continue to be one of the only states, if not the only state, that is silent at the state level with regard to exemptions for service-related disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 9 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Exemptions To Real Property Taxes For An Individual With A Disability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-30 Signed by Governor
2017-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT
2017-06-30 Amendment HA 1 to SB 38 - Stricken in House
2017-06-21 Amendment HA 1 to SB 38 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Veterans Affairs) in House with 1 Favorable, 15 On Its Merits
2017-06-01 Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in House
2017-05-18 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-03-30 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-03-21 Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback