DE SB36 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act more effectively and efficiently clarifies the enforcement authority of the Department of Agriculture regarding livestock at large. The offenses will now be civil penalties rather than criminal fines, expenses for impoundment will be reimbursed by the violator, and other sources of media can be used to give public notice of impoundment or sale of any livestock at large. This Act is intended to penalize repeat offenders that knowingly let their livestock run at large.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 3 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Stray Livestock.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-08 Signed by Governor
2017-05-02 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-04-26 Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in House with 4 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2017-04-04 Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House
2017-03-30 Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT
2017-03-29 Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in Senate with 4 Favorable
2017-03-21 Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback