DE SB35 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on September 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act enacts the Recognition of Emergency Medical Services Personnel Licensure Interstate Compact Act ("REPLICA"). With REPLICA, EMS personnel will be able to respond across state borders within the provision of their duties on a short term, intermittent basis on a privilege to practice under approved circumstances. REPLICA promotes compliance with the laws governing EMS personnel practice in each member state, home and remote, and gives states the ability to hold providers accountable from both. EMS personnel covered by REPLICA include those responding to calls for assistance across state lines as part of their duty, covering large scale planned events such as staffing concerts, sporting events, or large scale unplanned events where federal agencies are dispatched to support details, for example, wildland firefighting teams. REPLICA comes into effect on the date on which the compact statute is enacted into law in the 10th member state. Seven states have enacted REPLICA, including Virginia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Adoption Of The Recognition Of Emergency Medical Services Personnel Licensure Interstate Compact Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-15 Signed by Governor
2017-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 9 On Its Merits
2017-06-01 Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2017-05-18 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-05-18 Amendment SA 1 to SB 35 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-05-17 Amendment SA 1 to SB 35 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-04-05 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-03-21 Introduced and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback