DE SB34 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This legislation expands the composition of the State Employee Benefits Committee and provides Delaware public employees with representation on the Committee.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The State Employee Benefit Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2012-03-21 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2012-03-20 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House | |
2012-03-15 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 4 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-03-30 | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2011-03-22 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |