DE SB34 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on May 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on May 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill tightens a few areas in the termination of parental rights statute pertaining to children abandoned by their parents or killed or almost killed by their parents. First, it expands the abandonment age from 6 months to 6 years old where children are left in circumstances which place the child at substantial risk of injury or death. It also allows termination of parental rights, where the grounds can be proven, if a parent causes the death or near death of any child, and includes reckless conduct as well. Author: Senator Blevins
Title
An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Termination And Transfer Of Parental Rights In Adoption Proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-04-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-04-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-30 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-04-29 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2009-04-22 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2009-04-09 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-04-01 | Reported Out of Committee (CHILDREN; YOUTH & FAMILIES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2009-03-24 | Assigned to Children; Youth & Families Committee in Senate |