DE SB320 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act creates a new license category of speech/language pathology assistant that is licensed and regulated by the Board of Speech/Language Pathologists, Audiologists, and Hearing Aid Dispensers. This addition is needed to address the shortage of speech/language pathology services in the State, particularly in public schools. The speech/language pathology assistant must practice under the supervision of a licensed speech/language pathologist. The parameters of that supervision will be specified in rules and regulations. A speech/language pathology assistant will be able to support and supplement the services provided by the supervising speech/language pathologist subject to the limits of the permissible scope of practice. This Act specifies that to qualify for licensure, the speech/language pathology assistant must hold certification issued by the American Speech-Language-Hearing Association (ASHA). The requirements for that certification include education, clinical experience, and successful completion of an examination. The applicant must also meet this States requirements as set forth in this Act.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Board Of Speech/language Pathologists, Audiologists, And Hearing Aid Dispensers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2024-06-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2024-06-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2024-06-13 | Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |
2024-06-12 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2024-06-06 | Introduced and Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate |