DE SB32 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act establishes a procedure by which a mortgagee that changes its notice address from the notice address as provided in any mortgage or assignment of mortgage may, at its option, provide public notice of its new notice address.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 25 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Mortgages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-30 Signed by Governor
2017-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-06-30 Amendment HA 1 to SB 32 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-05-17 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 9 On Its Merits
2017-04-25 Amendment HA 1 to SB 32 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-04-06 Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
2017-04-05 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-03-30 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-03-16 Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback