DE SB317 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act is identical to Senate Substitute No. 1 to Senate Bill No. 9, which establishes new formulas that a community owner is allowed use to increase rent in a manufactured home community. The requirements under this Act will be in effect for 5 years, during which time the current requirements for rent increases in manufactured home communities will be suspended.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 9, Title 16, Title 25, And Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Manufactured Home Communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 3 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2022-06-30 | Amendment HA 2 to SB 317 - Defeated By House. Votes: 7 YES 34 NO | |
2022-06-30 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 317 - Defeated By House. Votes: 7 YES 32 NO 2 ABSENT | |
2022-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 3 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-22 | Amendment HA 2 to SB 317 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-06-22 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 317 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-06-21 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2022-06-09 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |
2022-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Housing) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-09 | Lifted from the Table and Assigned to Housing Committee in Senate | |
2022-06-08 | Introduced and Laid on Table in Senate |