DE SB316 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-7)
Status: Passed on October 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-7)
Status: Passed on October 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act caps the amount that an individual, group, or State employee plan may charge for diabetes equipment and supplies, other than insulin, at $35 per month. This cap does not apply to accident-only, specified disease, hospital indemnity, Medicare supplement, long-term care, disability income, or other limited benefit health insurance policies.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 And Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Insurance Coverage Of Diabetes Equipment And Supplies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-26 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-29 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2022-06-29 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 316 - Defeated In House by Voice Vote | |
2022-06-29 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 316 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-06-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 4 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-23 | Re-Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2022-06-23 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House | |
2022-06-22 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-22 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 316 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-16 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 316 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-08 | Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate |