DE SB316 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill would restrict the use of covenants, restrictions, and conditions in deeds, contracts and other legal instruments, which prohibit or unreasonably restrict the installation and use of ground mounted solar energy systems on land zoned residential, where the lots are one-half acre or greater in size.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 25 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Solar Photovoltaic Systems And Real Property.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Bushweller [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Sen. Harris McDowell [D] | Sen. Karen Peterson [D] |
Sen. David Sokola [D] | Rep. D.E. Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-28 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-30 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 23 YES 10 NO 6 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-30 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2010-06-25 | Introduced and Assigned to Energy Committee in House | |
2010-06-24 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 0 NO 3 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-24 | Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 0 NO 3 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-24 | Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate | |
2010-06-24 | Amendment SA 1 - Stricken | |
2010-06-23 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2010-06-23 | Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-17 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |