DE SB31 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-9)
Status: Enrolled on January 28 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act is the second leg of a constitutional amendment to add race, color, and national origin to ยง 21 of Article I of the Delaware Constitution to explicitly declare that protection against discrimination based on race, color, and national origin is one of Delaware's fundamental rights. The first leg of this constitutional amendment was Senate Bill 191 of the 150th General Assembly, published in Chapter 287 of Volume 82 of the Laws of Delaware. On passage of this second leg by this General Assembly this amendment will become part of the Delaware Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concurring In A Proposed Amendment To Article I Of The Delaware Constitution Relating To Equal Rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-28 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2021-01-26 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2021-01-22 Assigned to Administration Committee in House
2021-01-21 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2021-01-21 Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 6 Favorable
2021-01-12 Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback