DE SB31 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2013 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-08 - Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2013 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-08 - Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
his bill adds active members of the Ladies auxiliary or volunteer fire department ladies auxiliary as eligible for free surf fishing licenses. The bill also gives the department President’s discretion in determining what qualifies as 'active" member.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Free Surf Fishing Vehicle Permits For Certain Volunteers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate |