DE SB307 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-8)
Status: Passed on August 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-8)
Status: Passed on August 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill reflects the reality that grooming children for the purpose of committing crimes of sexual violence against them is often preceded by conduct that perpetrators know will make the child particularly susceptible to abuse. The bill requires proof that a person has engaged in three or more specific instances of conduct proscribed by the statute. Each of these predicate acts would not otherwise be considered criminal conduct, so the bill requires proof of a pattern of conduct aimed at a specific outcome. By outlawing grooming, the State will be explicitly empowered to stop a predator who engages in certain conduct with the intent to entice, persuade, induce, or coerce a child into participating in a sexual act with the perpetrator. A conviction for grooming is a stand-alone offense and is a felony punishable by up to 3 years in jail.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Crimes And Criminal Procedure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-29 | Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 4 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2022-06-29 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 307 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2022-06-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-10 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2022-06-09 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2022-06-08 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-02 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |