DE SB30 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
Pending: House Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
Pending: House Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act adopts the Uniform Law Commission's Revised Athlete Agents Act ("Revised Act"), revising Chapter 54, Title 24 of the Delaware Code, which is based on the Uniform Law Commission's Uniform Athlete Agents Act ("Uniform Act").
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Athlete Agents.
Sponsors
Sen. David Sokola [D] | Sen. Catherine Cloutier [R] | Rep. Earl Jaques [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] |
Sen. Ernesto Lopez [R] | Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |
2019-05-07 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-05-07 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 30 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-03-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-05 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |