DE SB3 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on August 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act replaces the stillbirth certificate with a certificate of birth resulting in stillbirth, clarifies what documentation is required upon the occurrence of a stillbirth, and makes technical corrections to the Vital Statistics laws to accurately reflect current practices. This Act does not change the current reporting requirements regarding births or deaths.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Vital Statistics.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-09 Signed by Governor
2017-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2017-06-09 Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2017-06-08 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-06-07 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2017-06-06 Introduced and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback