DE SB3 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on August 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on August 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act replaces the stillbirth certificate with a certificate of birth resulting in stillbirth, clarifies what documentation is required upon the occurrence of a stillbirth, and makes technical corrections to the Vital Statistics laws to accurately reflect current practices. This Act does not change the current reporting requirements regarding births or deaths.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Vital Statistics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-09 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2017-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-09 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2017-06-08 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2017-06-07 | Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-06 | Introduced and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate |