DE SB296 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill raises the threshold for licensed property appraisers so that they may appraise residential units valued at $400,000.00 or less as a way to meet market demand. It also changes the requirements for licensure, such that property appraisers must file annual certificates but only renew their registrations every other year.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Professions And Occupations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2022-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-09 | Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |
2022-06-08 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-06-07 | Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-05-11 | Introduced and Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate |