DE SB296 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-30 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-30 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill establishes a procedure by which a mortgagee which changes its notice address from the notice address as provided in any mortgage or assignment of mortgage, may, at its option, provide public notice of its new notice address.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 25 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Mortgages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |