DE SB29 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act enhances 2 existing agricultural horse racing programs, the Delaware Standardbred Breeder's Program and the Delaware Certified Thoroughbred program, by providing additional funding. Under this Act, horsemen provide half of the additional funds from purse money and the State provides half of the additional funds with matching funds.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The State Lottery Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-23 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2021-06-04 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-04-01 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2021-03-31 | Reported Out of Committee (Gaming & Parimutuels) in House with 5 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2021-03-17 | Assigned to Gaming & Parimutuels Committee in House | |
2021-03-16 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-03-16 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 29 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-03-11 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2021-02-12 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 29 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-01-21 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2021-01-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2021-01-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |