DE SB288 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill would create a pilot program whereby motorcyclists are permitted to use flashing headlights as a way to alert other drivers of their presence, without allowing the use of flashing lights that would otherwise be used on emergency vehicles. The bill aims to protect motorcyclists on Delawares roads and has a sunsetting provision that will allow time for further traffic studies to determine the effectiveness of this pilot program.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Motorcycle Safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Rep. Daniel Short [R] | Sen. Kyle Gay [D] | Sen. David Lawson [R] |
Sen. Bryant Richardson [R] | Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-29 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-10 | Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |
2022-06-09 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-06-09 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 288 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-06-09 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2022-06-08 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 288 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-06-08 | Laid On Table in Senate | |
2022-06-07 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-05-06 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate |