DE SB286 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on October 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on October 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act shall be known as the New Castle County Neighborhood Improvement District Act. The Act assembles New Castle County resources under one roof to focus comprehensively on persistent, and in some cases legacy, neighborhood problems, thereby promoting the possibilities of successfully resolving systemic neighborhood problems.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 9 And Title 17 Of The Delaware Code Relating To New Castle County Neighborhood Improvement Districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] | Sen. Jack Walsh [D] | Sen. Sarah McBride [D] | Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] |
Rep. Edward Osienski [D] | Sen. Kyle Gay [D] | Sen. David Sokola [D] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] |
Rep. Kevin Hensley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-23 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 2 NO 2 ABSENT | |
2022-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-05-31 | Re-Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2022-05-18 | Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House | |
2022-05-17 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2022-05-11 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2022-05-05 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |