DE SB283 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-17-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-17-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act requires the Attorney General to screen challenges to public record request denials, if a state agency is involved. All such alleged violations must first be reviewed by the Chief Deputy. If the Chief Deputy determines that an agency should have produced the requested records, the Attorney General’s Office may not represent the agency in any further legal action if that agency fails to comply with the Chief Deputy’s decision. The Bill also permits a litigant, after requesting a decision by the Attorney General, to appeal the matter to the Superior Court on the record. The Bill does not affect existing process regarding alleged records violations by school districts, municipalities, and counties.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Freedom Of Information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-29 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 36 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 5 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-24 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 3 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-23 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House | |
2010-06-22 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-22 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-22 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate | |
2010-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-08 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |