DE SB281 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on September 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on September 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill codifies the Delaware Suicide Prevention Coalition.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Mental Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-29 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 8 On Its Merits |
2016-06-28 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |