DE SB280 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Transfer Of Certain Properties Located In The Town Of Smyrna.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Authorize The Transfer Of Certain Properties Located In The Town Of Smyrna.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-10SenateSigned by Governor
2016-07-01HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-06-29HouseReported Out of Committee (HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS) in House with 1 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits
2016-06-28HouseIntroduced and Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House
2016-06-23SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-06-22SenateReported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2016-06-15SenateAssigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback